LA SB313 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the designated gaming area at live horse racing facilities. (8/1/18)
Title
Provides relative to the designated gaming area at live horse racing facilities. (8/1/18)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 313 FINAL PASSAGE (#505) (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 18 yeas and 17 nays. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |