LA SB313 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Effective date 7/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Effective date 7/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to allocation of monies from the St. Tammany Parish Fund. (7/1/12) (EN NO IMPACT SD RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to allocation of monies from the St. Tammany Parish Fund. (7/1/12) (EN NO IMPACT SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 313, CONCUR (#1245) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 313, REJECT (#917) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - House Vote on SB 313, FINAL PASSAGE (#752) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 313, FINAL PASSAGE (#161) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 313, REJECT (#917) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - House Vote on SB 313, FINAL PASSAGE (#752) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 313, FINAL PASSAGE (#161) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Effective date 7/1/12. | |
2012-06-01 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 465. | |
2012-05-24 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-05-23 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-23 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-22 | Notice Senate reconsidered and concurred in House Amendments. | |
2012-05-22 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2012-05-22 | Reconsidered. | |
2012-05-22 | Rules suspended | |
2012-05-15 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2012-05-15 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Donahue, Appel, and Murray. | |
2012-05-14 | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. | |
2012-05-14 | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2012-05-10 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2012-05-09 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-30 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/9/2012. | |
2012-04-26 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent. | |
2012-04-25 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-04-24 | Reported favorably (17-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-04-02 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2012-03-29 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-03-28 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-03-27 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-03-26 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | |
2012-03-01 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |