LA SB31 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Effective date 8/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Effective date 8/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates database to track trafficking arrests, convictions, restitution, fines, and civil asset forfeiture. (8/1/23) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Creates database to track trafficking arrests, convictions, restitution, fines, and civil asset forfeiture. (8/1/23) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 31 FINAL PASSAGE (#808) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 31 CO-AUTHORS (#141) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 31 FINAL PASSAGE (#140) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 31 CO-AUTHORS (#141) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 31 FINAL PASSAGE (#140) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-14 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2023. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 386. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2023-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2023-05-31 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2023. |
2023-05-22 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-18 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2023-05-17 | House | Reported favorably (9-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2023-05-02 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2023-05-01 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |