LA SB31 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Includes certain numismatic coins in the definition of tangible personal property subject to sales and use tax. (7/1/17) (EG INCREASE GF RV See Note)
Title
Includes certain numismatic coins in the definition of tangible personal property subject to sales and use tax. (7/1/17) (EG INCREASE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 31 FINAL PASSAGE (#198) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 31 AMENDMENT # 1311 BY PEACOCK SB 31 BY MORRELL (#197) (Y: 17 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 31 AMENDMENT # 1311 BY PEACOCK SB 31 BY MORRELL (#197) (Y: 17 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-05-08 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 3 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |