LA SB31 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Effective date 6/17/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Effective date 6/17/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts the Board Scholarship Reporting Act relative to scholarships awarded by members of public postsecondary education management boards.
Title
Enacts the Board Scholarship Reporting Act relative to scholarships awarded by members of public postsecondary education management boards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 31 MOTION TO ADOPT (#915) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 31 ADOPT (#980) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 31 REJECT (#596) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - House - House Vote on SB 31 FINAL PASSAGE (#489) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 31, CO-AUTHORS (#69) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 31, FINAL PASSAGE (#68) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 31 ADOPT (#980) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 31 REJECT (#596) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - House - House Vote on SB 31 FINAL PASSAGE (#489) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 31, CO-AUTHORS (#69) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 31, FINAL PASSAGE (#68) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | Senate | Effective date 6/17/2013. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 340. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-05 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2013-06-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/5/2013. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/4/2013. |
2013-06-03 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2013-05-30 | House | House conferees appointed: Broadwater, Carter, and Robideaux. |
2013-05-29 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Claitor, Appel, and Heitmeier. |
2013-05-28 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2013-05-20 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/20/2013. |
2013-05-10 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-09 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-04-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-04-17 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Prefiled. |