LA SB31 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-29 - Effective date 8/15/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-29 - Effective date 8/15/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increases authorized court costs for municipal ordinance violations in the mayor's court in the town of New Llano. (8/15/11) (EN +$40,000 LF RV See Note)
Title
Increases authorized court costs for municipal ordinance violations in the mayor's court in the town of New Llano. (8/15/11) (EN +$40,000 LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. John Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - House - House Vote on SB 31, FINAL PASSAGE (#751) (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 31, FINAL PASSAGE (#137) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 31, FINAL PASSAGE (#137) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-29 | Effective date 8/15/11. | |
2011-06-29 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 324. | |
2011-06-22 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2011-06-21 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-20 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-20 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2011-06-20 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 4. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-19 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011. | |
2011-06-19 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-16 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2011-06-15 | Reported favorably (10-0-1) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-05-18 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2011-05-17 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2011-05-16 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-11 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-10 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-04-25 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Finance. | |
2011-03-31 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Finance. |