LA SB306 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to Assistive Outpatient Treatment. (8/1/18)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to Assistive Outpatient Treatment. (8/1/18)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 306 CONCUR (#1090) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Vote on SB 306 FINAL PASSAGE (#751) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 306 FINAL PASSAGE (#269) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-20SenateEffective date 8/1/2018.
2018-05-20SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 375.
2018-05-16SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-15SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-14SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays.
2018-05-14SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2018-05-08SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2018-05-08SenateRules suspended.
2018-05-07SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-05-03HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-03HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/03/18.
2018-04-19HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-18HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-17HouseReported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-06HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-04-05HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-04SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-22SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-21SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-03-02SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB306&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1072576
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077786
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083205
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096700
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101139
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077585
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077961
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088772
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093827
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1072579
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078117
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078445
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083291
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101098
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083142
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093195
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096577

Bill Comments

feedback