LA SB303 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to bullying. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to bullying. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 303 CO-AUTHORS (#157) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 303 FINAL PASSAGE (#156) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseInvoluntarily deferred in committee.
2018-03-29HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-03-28HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-03-27SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-26SenateRead by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 5 for March 27, 2018.
2018-03-26SenateRules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
2018-03-26SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2018-03-20SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-19SenateReported with amendments.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-03-02SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB303&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1072335
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075708
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079791
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075685
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078760
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079103
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093741
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1072337
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077215
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079860
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079777
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079779

Bill Comments

feedback