LA SB30 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 1/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 1/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adds Pointe Coupee Parish to the territorial limits and jurisdiction of the Greater Baton Rouge Port Commission. (2/3 - CA6s43(2)) (1/1/20)
Title
Adds Pointe Coupee Parish to the territorial limits and jurisdiction of the Greater Baton Rouge Port Commission. (2/3 - CA6s43(2)) (1/1/20)
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 30 CONCUR (#654) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 30 FINAL PASSAGE (#732) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 30 FINAL PASSAGE (#185) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 30 FINAL PASSAGE (#732) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 30 FINAL PASSAGE (#185) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2020. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 180. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2019-05-30 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19. |
2019-05-23 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-22 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2019-05-21 | House | Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-21 | House | House committee amendments rejected. |
2019-05-20 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-05-02 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-05-01 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |