LA SB30 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date 5/15/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date 5/15/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a member of the Louisiana City Court Judges Association be added to the membership of the Louisiana State Law Institute. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides that a member of the Louisiana City Court Judges Association be added to the membership of the Louisiana State Law Institute. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - House Vote on SB 30 FINAL PASSAGE (#698) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 30 FINAL PASSAGE (#64) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 30 FINAL PASSAGE (#64) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Effective date 5/15/2018. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 220. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-02 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/18. |
2018-04-18 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-17 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported favorably (7-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-03-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-03-19 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |