LA SB3 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date 5/15/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for benefits for survivors of hazardous duty plan members killed by an intentional act of violence. (2/3 - CA 10s29(F)) (gov sig) (EN INCREASE APV)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for benefits for survivors of hazardous duty plan members killed by an intentional act of violence. (2/3 - CA 10s29(F)) (gov sig) (EN INCREASE APV)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 3 CONCUR (#813) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Vote on SB 3 FINAL PASSAGE (#772) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 3 FINAL PASSAGE (#19) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateEffective date 5/15/2018.
2018-05-15SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 224.
2018-05-11SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-09HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-09SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-08SenateRules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays.
2018-05-07SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-05-07HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/07/18.
2018-04-23HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-19HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-18HouseReported with amendments (5-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-03-19HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2018-03-15HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-03-15SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-14SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-13SenateReported with amendments.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2018-01-22SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB3&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1060931
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1072626
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1074333
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075295
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1091243
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094224
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095838
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1100061
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073858
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087920
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085031
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093920
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1060932
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075206
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087913
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096079
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075315
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093639
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094170

Bill Comments

feedback