LA SB3 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date 6/30/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the treasurer and the secretary of state to be members of the board of trustees. (6/30/17) (EN +$48,572 APV)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the treasurer and the secretary of state to be members of the board of trustees. (6/30/17) (EN +$48,572 APV)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 3 FINAL PASSAGE (#710) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 3 FINAL PASSAGE (#265) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-16SenateEffective date 6/30/2017.
2017-06-16SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 283.
2017-06-06SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2017-06-05HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2017-06-05SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2017-06-04SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2017-06-04HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2017-06-01HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/04/17.
2017-05-30HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-05-25HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2017-05-24HouseReported favorably (5-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-05-15HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2017-05-11HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2017-05-10SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 6 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-05-09SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-05-08SenateReported with amendments.
2017-04-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2017-02-08SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=SB3&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1021135
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1031745
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1039193
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040353
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040500
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041324
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048418
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049290
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1051862
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1039174
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1039661
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1021136
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040132
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040584
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1050538
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040452
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048317

Bill Comments

feedback