LA SB3 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides benefits for members hired on or after January 1, 2017. (6/30/16) (EG DECREASE APV)
Title
Provides benefits for members hired on or after January 1, 2017. (6/30/16) (EG DECREASE APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 3 FINAL PASSAGE (#275) (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2016-04-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 21 yeas and 15 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |