LA SB3 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Effective date 6/23/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Names the "Senator Chris Ullo Building". (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Names the "Senator Chris Ullo Building". (gov sig)

Sponsors

Sen. John Alario [R]Sen. Robert Adley [R]Sen. R Allain [R]Sen. Lee Amedee [R]
Sen. Conrad Appel [R]Sen. Sharon Broome [D]Sen. Troy Brown [D]Sen. Sherri Cheek [R]
Sen. Norby Chabert [R]Sen. Dan Claitor [R]Sen. Patrick Cortez [R]Sen. A.G. Crowe [R]
Sen. Jack Donahue [R]Sen. Yvonne Dorsey-Colomb [D]Sen. Dale Erdey [R]Sen. Richard Gallot [D]
Sen. Elbert Guillory [D]Sen. David Heitmeier [D]Sen. Ronnie Johns [R]Sen. Robert Kostelka [R]
Sen. Eric LaFleur [D]Sen. Gerald Long [R]Sen. Daniel Martiny [R]Sen. Fred Mills [R]
Sen. Jean-Paul Morrell [D]Sen. Dan Morrish [R]Sen. Edwin Murray [D]Sen. Ben Nevers [D]
Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]Sen. Jonathan Perry [R]Sen. Karen Peterson [D]Sen. Neil Riser [R]
Sen. Gary Smith [D]Sen. John Smith [R]Sen. Gregory Tarver [D]Sen. Francis Thompson [D]
Sen. Michael Walsworth [R]Sen. Rick Ward [D]Sen. Mack White [R]Rep. Bryan Adams [R]
Rep. Jeffery Arnold [D]Rep. Austin Badon [D]Rep. Taylor Barras [R]Rep. Robert Billiot [D]
Rep. Stuart Bishop [R]Sen. Wesley Bishop [D]Rep. Joseph Bouie [D]Rep. Roy Burrell [D]
Rep. Patrick Connick [R]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Gordon Dove [R]Rep. John Edwards [D]
Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D]Rep. Mickey Guillory [D]Rep. Cameron Henry [R]
Rep. Paul Hollis [R]Rep. Frank Howard [R]Rep. Sam Jones [D]Rep. Charles Kleckley [R]
Rep. Bernard LeBas [D]Rep. Walt Leger [D]Rep. Christopher Leopold [R]Rep. Barbara Norton [D]
Rep. Stephen Ortego [D]Rep. Eugene Reynolds [D]Rep. Jerome Richard [I]Rep. Harold Ritchie [D]
Rep. Scott Simon [R]Rep. Karen St Germain [D]Rep. Kirk Talbot [R]Rep. Alfred Williams [D]
Rep. Thomas Willmott [R]

Roll Calls

2015-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 3 FINAL PASSAGE (#688) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 3 FINAL PASSAGE (#272) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-23SenateEffective date 6/23/2015.
2015-06-23SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 148.
2015-06-04SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2015-06-04HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2015-06-03SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2015-06-02SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2015-06-02HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2015-05-28HouseScheduled for floor debate on 6/2/2015.
2015-05-26HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-05-21HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2015-05-20HouseReported favorably (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2015-05-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2015-05-12HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2015-05-11SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2015-05-07SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2015-05-06SenateReported favorably.
2015-04-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2015-02-02SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback