LA SB291 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date 5/23/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to family violence and domestic abuse as factors to consider in determining visitation and custody. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to family violence and domestic abuse as factors to consider in determining visitation and custody. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 291 CONCUR (#1339) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 291 FINAL PASSAGE (#1295) (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on SB 291 AMENDMENT # 3735 BY LANDRY N. MOTION TO ADOPT (#890) (Y: 47 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 291 FINAL PASSAGE (#192) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23SenateEffective date 5/23/2018.
2018-05-23SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 412.
2018-05-18SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
2018-05-18HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-18SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-18SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays.
2018-05-17SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-05-17HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 77, nays 18. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-17HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-05-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18.
2018-05-16HouseNotice given.
2018-05-14HouseNotice removed
2018-05-10HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/14/18.
2018-05-10HouseNotice given.
2018-05-10HouseNotice removed
2018-05-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18.
2018-05-09HouseNotice given.
2018-05-09HouseRead by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
2018-05-09HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-05-08HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/09/18.
2018-05-08HouseNotice given.
2018-05-08HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/08/18.
2018-04-26HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-25HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-24HouseReported with amendments (6-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-04HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2018-04-03HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-02SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-27SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-26SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2018-03-01SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB291&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1071432
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079067
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1081700
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099338
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101375
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078855
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079205
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1081030
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088717
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089627
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1091769
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095122
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095127
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094831
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095126
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096914
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097195
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097529
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098772
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098915
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1071437
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079820
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1081797
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101432
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1081542
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098788
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099222

Bill Comments

feedback