LA SB29 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to professional and occupational licensing boards and commissions. (8/1/19)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to professional and occupational licensing boards and commissions. (8/1/19)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 29 FINAL PASSAGE (#149) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19.
2019-05-22HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-21HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-20HouseReported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-01HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2019-04-30HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-29SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-25SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-24SenateReported favorably.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2019-03-19SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback