LA SB289 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the special assessment level for, and exemptions for disabled veterans and their spouses, and for surviving spouses of military personnel, law enforcement and fire protection officers, and first responders from, ad valorem tax purposes on homesteads when naked ownership is in trust. (See Act) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the special assessment level for, and exemptions for disabled veterans and their spouses, and for surviving spouses of military personnel, law enforcement and fire protection officers, and first responders from, ad valorem tax purposes on homesteads when naked ownership is in trust. (See Act) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 289 CONCUR (#1265) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 289 FINAL PASSAGE (#1187) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 289 FINAL PASSAGE (#299) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 289 FINAL PASSAGE (#1187) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 289 FINAL PASSAGE (#299) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | Effective date: See Act. |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 659. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18. |
2018-05-14 | House | Notice given. |
2018-05-14 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/18. |
2018-05-03 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-02 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-05-01 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-04-09 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |