LA SB287 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for fair treatment for materials produced, manufactured, or fabricated in Louisiana used in public works. (8/1/12)
Title
Provides for fair treatment for materials produced, manufactured, or fabricated in Louisiana used in public works. (8/1/12)
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Nevers [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 287, FINAL PASSAGE (#283) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2012-04-10 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-04-09 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 20 yeas and 17 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-03 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-02 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |
2012-03-01 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |