LA SB286 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Physician's Bill of Rights. (8/1/18) (RE INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the Physician's Bill of Rights. (8/1/18) (RE INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 286 FINAL PASSAGE (#342) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 286 AMENDMENT # 2294 BY PEACOCK SB 286 BY MILKOVICH (#341) (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 286 AMENDMENT # 2294 BY PEACOCK SB 286 BY MILKOVICH (#341) (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2018-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-04-11 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |