LA SB283 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-10-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date 7/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-10-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date 7/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the content of certain Civics courses. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the content of certain Civics courses. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 283 CONCUR (#984) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 283 FINAL PASSAGE (#798) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 283 FINAL PASSAGE (#334) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 283 FINAL PASSAGE (#798) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 283 FINAL PASSAGE (#334) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2015. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 469. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2015-06-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. |
2015-06-06 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2015-06-04 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2015. |
2015-06-01 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-28 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-05-19 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2015-05-18 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Substitute for Senate Bill No. 34. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |