LA SB275 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Effective date 7/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Effective date 7/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires cursive writing be taught in public schools. (7/1/17) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Title
Requires cursive writing be taught in public schools. (7/1/17) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 275 CONCUR (#1151) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - House Vote on SB 275 FINAL PASSAGE (#1069) (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 275 CO-AUTHORS (#427) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 275 FINAL PASSAGE (#426) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - House Vote on SB 275 FINAL PASSAGE (#1069) (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 275 CO-AUTHORS (#427) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 275 FINAL PASSAGE (#426) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2017. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 482. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2016-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2016-05-26 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-26 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-05-26 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-05-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2016. |
2016-05-19 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-18 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2016-05-17 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-04-28 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2016-04-27 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |