LA SB272 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Effective date 8/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Effective date 8/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that changes to the forms by the Supervisory Committee on Campaign Finance and personal financial disclosure forms by the Board of Ethics shall be accomplished through approval of the Committees on Senate and Governmental Affairs and House and Governmental Affairs. (8/1/14)
Title
Provides that changes to the forms by the Supervisory Committee on Campaign Finance and personal financial disclosure forms by the Board of Ethics shall be accomplished through approval of the Committees on Senate and Governmental Affairs and House and Governmental Affairs. (8/1/14)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 272 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1624) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 272 ADOPT (#1693) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 272 REJECT (#1518) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 272 FINAL PASSAGE (#1312) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 272 FINAL PASSAGE (#96) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 272 ADOPT (#1693) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 272 REJECT (#1518) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 272 FINAL PASSAGE (#1312) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 272 FINAL PASSAGE (#96) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2014. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 857. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/3/2014. |
2014-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2014-06-02 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2014-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2014. |
2014-06-01 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2014-06-01 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays. |
2014-06-01 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2014-06-01 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2014-05-29 | House | House conferees appointed: Miller, Tim Burns, and Danahay. |
2014-05-29 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Murray, Amedee, and Tarver. |
2014-05-29 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2014-05-28 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2014. |
2014-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-05-14 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2014-05-13 | House | Reported with amendments (5-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-03-26 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-03-25 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |