LA SB271 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for medical marijuana. (See Act) (RE1 SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for medical marijuana. (See Act) (RE1 SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 271 CONCUR (#775) (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House Vote on SB 271 FINAL PASSAGE (#757) (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House Vote on SB 271 AMENDMENT # 4287 BY MACK MOTION TO ADOPT (#756) (Y: 32 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 271 FINAL PASSAGE (#348) (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 271 AMENDMENT # 1882 BY MARTINY SB 271 BY MILLS (#347) (Y: 11 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 271 FINAL PASSAGE (#318) (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 271 AMENDMENT # 1801 BY CLAITOR SB 271 BY MILLS (#317) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-19SenateEffective date: See Act.
2016-05-19SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 96.
2016-05-18SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2016-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2016-05-17SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2016-05-16SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 22 yeas and 14 nays.
2016-05-12SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2016-05-11HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 62, nays 32. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2016-05-05HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2016.
2016-05-05HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2016-05-04HouseReported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
2016-05-03HouseReported with amendments (8-6). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2016-04-25HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2016-04-21HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2016-04-20SenateThe bill, as previously amended, was read by title, passed by a vote of 21 yeas and 16 nays, ordered reengrossed, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2016-04-20SenateRules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
2016-04-20SenateReconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2016-04-19SenateNotice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
2016-04-19SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 19 yeas and 16 nays.
2016-04-19SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2016-04-18SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2016-04-14SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2016-04-13SenateReported with amendments.
2016-03-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2016-03-04SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=16rs&b=SB271&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=983501
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=994184
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=996346
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1003807
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1005148
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=994102
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=994474
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=995760
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=994956
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=995816
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=996247
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=996272
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=999667
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=999626
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=999567
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=999432
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=999156
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=999863
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1000162
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1002193
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1002564
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1002573
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1002853
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1003510
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=983503
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=993643
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=994685
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=995264
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=996590
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=999368
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=999856
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1004503
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=995830
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=996293
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1002866
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1003702

Bill Comments

feedback