LA SB270 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - Indefinitely postponed by vote of yeas 48, nays 47.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - Indefinitely postponed by vote of yeas 48, nays 47.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to penalties for littering convictions. (8/15/11)
Title
Provides relative to penalties for littering convictions. (8/15/11)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - House - House Vote on SB 270, INDEFINITELY POSTPONE (#757) (Y: 48 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - House - House Vote on SB 270, INDEFINITELY POSTPONED the BILL (#786) (Y: 43 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 270, FINAL PASSAGE (#560) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 270, FINAL PASSAGE (#489) (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - House - House Vote on SB 270, INDEFINITELY POSTPONED the BILL (#786) (Y: 43 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 270, FINAL PASSAGE (#560) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 270, FINAL PASSAGE (#489) (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-20 | Indefinitely postponed by vote of yeas 48, nays 47. | |
2011-06-19 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011. | |
2011-06-19 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-19 | Rules suspended. | |
2011-06-19 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2011-06-19 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-14 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |
2011-06-14 | Rules suspended. | |
2011-06-14 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2011-06-14 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-14 | Reconsidered. | |
2011-06-14 | Rules suspended | |
2011-06-13 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | |
2011-06-13 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 15 yeas and 13 nays. | |
2011-06-09 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2011-06-08 | Substitute for Senate Bill No. 247. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |