LA SB27 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Medicaid Pharmaceutical and Therapeutics Committee. (8/1/18)
Title
Provides relative to the Medicaid Pharmaceutical and Therapeutics Committee. (8/1/18)
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 27 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1337) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 27 ADOPT (#1239) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 27 REJECT (#637) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Vote on SB 27 FINAL PASSAGE (#624) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 27 FINAL PASSAGE (#168) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 27 ADOPT (#1239) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 27 REJECT (#637) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Vote on SB 27 FINAL PASSAGE (#624) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 27 FINAL PASSAGE (#168) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2018. |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 644. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2018-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2018-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-16 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2018-05-15 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2018-05-10 | House | House conferees appointed: LeBas, Hoffmann, and Smith. |
2018-05-09 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Mills, Claitor, and Luneau. |
2018-05-01 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-04-27 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/18. |
2018-04-16 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-13 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-02 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-03-29 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |