LA SB27 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to exempt diapers and feminine hygiene products from state sales and use tax. (2/3 - CA13s1(A)) (EG DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Title
Constitutional amendment to exempt diapers and feminine hygiene products from state sales and use tax. (2/3 - CA13s1(A)) (EG DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |