LA SB27 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts a registered owner of a motor vehicle who is a member of the armed services from the duty to maintain liability security while on active duty overseas. (8/15/10)
Title
Exempts a registered owner of a motor vehicle who is a member of the armed services from the duty to maintain liability security while on active duty overseas. (8/15/10)
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Adley [R] | Sen. Nicholas Gautreaux [D] | Sen. Robert Marionneaux [D] | Sen. Edwin Murray [D] |
Rep. Neil Riser [R] | Sen. B.L. Shaw [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on SB 27, FINAL PASSAGE (#1288) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 27, FINAL PASSAGE (#158) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 27, FINAL PASSAGE (#158) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Effective date 8/15/10. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 330. | |
2010-06-11 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-06-10 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-10 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-09 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-06-09 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-04 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/9/2010. | |
2010-05-24 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-20 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-05-19 | Reported favorably (12-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-04-19 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2010-04-15 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-04-14 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-04-13 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-04-12 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |
2010-03-08 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |