LA SB263 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to permit the donation of the use of public equipment and personnel to the state or a political subdivision. (2/3 - CA13s1) (EN SEE FISC NOTE See Note)
Title
Constitutional amendment to permit the donation of the use of public equipment and personnel to the state or a political subdivision. (2/3 - CA13s1) (EN SEE FISC NOTE See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Erdey [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 263 CONCUR (#641) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Vote on SB 263 FINAL PASSAGE (#615) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 263 FINAL PASSAGE (#189) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Vote on SB 263 FINAL PASSAGE (#615) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 263 FINAL PASSAGE (#189) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | Effective date: See Act. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Becomes Act No. 717 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-04-27 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/18. |
2018-04-12 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported without amendments (6-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-09 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-04-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2018-04-03 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |