LA SB262 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-20 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-20 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the Louisiana Board of Emergency Medical Services. (7/1/13) (RE -$251,678 GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for the Louisiana Board of Emergency Medical Services. (7/1/13) (RE -$251,678 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 262 FINAL PASSAGE (#401) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2013-05-16 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Substitute for Senate Bill No. 198. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |