LA SB261 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective date 6/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective date 6/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for certain insurance benefits for firemen and law enforcement officers who suffer a catastrophic injury resulting in permanent and total disability caused by an individual with the specific intent to kill an officer while the fireman or officer is engaged in the performance of his official duties. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for certain insurance benefits for firemen and law enforcement officers who suffer a catastrophic injury resulting in permanent and total disability caused by an individual with the specific intent to kill an officer while the fireman or officer is engaged in the performance of his official duties. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 261 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1340) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 261 ADOPT (#1242) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 261 REJECT (#640) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Vote on SB 261 FINAL PASSAGE (#606) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 261 FINAL PASSAGE (#188) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 261 ADOPT (#1242) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 261 REJECT (#640) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Vote on SB 261 FINAL PASSAGE (#606) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 261 FINAL PASSAGE (#188) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | Effective date 6/1/2018. |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 656. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2018-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2018-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-16 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2018-05-15 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2018-05-09 | House | House conferees appointed: Pope, Berthelot, and Howard. |
2018-05-09 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Erdey, Gary Smith, and Peacock. |
2018-05-01 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-04-26 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/18. |
2018-04-10 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2018-04-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |