LA SB254 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date 5/23/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date 5/23/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Require BESE to establish criteria whereby a teacher may be issued a dyslexia practitioner or dyslexia therapist ancillary certificate. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Title
Require BESE to establish criteria whereby a teacher may be issued a dyslexia practitioner or dyslexia therapist ancillary certificate. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on SB 254 FINAL PASSAGE (#937) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 254 FINAL PASSAGE (#297) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 254 FINAL PASSAGE (#297) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Senate | Effective date 5/23/2018. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 411. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18. |
2018-04-30 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-04-09 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |