LA SB250 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires school governing authorities to provide parents with certain information relative to the health risks associated with pornography. (8/1/18) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Title
Requires school governing authorities to provide parents with certain information relative to the health risks associated with pornography. (8/1/18) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Beth Mizell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 250 CONCUR (#1062) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on SB 250 FINAL PASSAGE (#884) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 250 FINAL PASSAGE (#143) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on SB 250 FINAL PASSAGE (#884) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 250 FINAL PASSAGE (#143) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-20 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2018. |
2018-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 369. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-05-09 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-25 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-03-28 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-03-27 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |