LA SB25 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Effective date 6/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Effective date 6/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Sunsets the individual income tax education credit. (gov sig) (EN +$9,200,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Sunsets the individual income tax education credit. (gov sig) (EN +$9,200,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 25 CONCUR (#866) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 25 FINAL PASSAGE (#729) (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 25 FINAL PASSAGE (#304) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 25 FINAL PASSAGE (#729) (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 25 FINAL PASSAGE (#304) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | Senate | Effective date 6/23/2017. |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 375. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-06-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2017-06-04 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 23. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-04 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-06-04 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/17. |
2017-06-01 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-31 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2017-05-30 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-16 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-05-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |