LA SB246 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 489.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 489.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the delivery of alcoholic beverages. (8/1/18)
Title
Provides relative to the delivery of alcoholic beverages. (8/1/18)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Morrish [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 489. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported by substitute. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |