LA SB245 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective date 8/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective date 8/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to civil jury trials and deposits for costs and expenses. (8/1/21) (2/3 - CA7s2.1(A)) (EN NO IMPACT LF RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to civil jury trials and deposits for costs and expenses. (8/1/21) (2/3 - CA7s2.1(A)) (EN NO IMPACT LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 245 CONCUR (#999) (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 245 FINAL PASSAGE (#1059) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 245 FINAL PASSAGE (#242) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 245 FINAL PASSAGE (#1059) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 245 FINAL PASSAGE (#242) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2021. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 382. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2021-06-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 2 nays. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2021-06-07 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2021. |
2021-06-03 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-06-02 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2021-06-01 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-05 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2021-05-04 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Substitute for Senate Bill No. 71. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |