LA SB241 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to pharmacist communication with patients. (8/1/18)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to pharmacist communication with patients. (8/1/18)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 241 CONCUR (#959) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Vote on SB 241 FINAL PASSAGE (#742) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 241 FINAL PASSAGE (#83) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18SenateEffective date 8/1/2018.
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 317.
2018-05-11SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-10SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-09SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
2018-05-09SenateRules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
2018-05-08SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2018-05-08SenateRules suspended.
2018-05-07SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-05-03HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-03HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/03/18.
2018-04-19HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-18HouseReported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-17HouseReported favorably (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-02HouseRead by title, recommitted to the Committee on Insurance.
2018-04-02HouseDischarged from the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-03-20HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-03-19HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-03-19SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-15SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-14SenateReported favorably.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-03-01SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB241&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1070714
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1074901
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095064
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1100501
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1076207
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087768
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093587
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1070729
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075449
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096178
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1076516
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093180
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095053

Bill Comments

feedback