LA SB240 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the exchange of school lands by the Avoyelles Parish School Board. (gov sig)
Title
Provides for the exchange of school lands by the Avoyelles Parish School Board. (gov sig)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |