LA SB240 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Effective date 6/29/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Effective date 6/29/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Orleans Parish School Board to exclude certain costs from the amount of local funds that it would otherwise be required to transfer to the RSD. (8/15/10) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Title
Allows the Orleans Parish School Board to exclude certain costs from the amount of local funds that it would otherwise be required to transfer to the RSD. (8/15/10) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 240, CONCUR (#1810) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 240, FINAL PASSAGE (#1583) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 240, FINAL PASSAGE (#493) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 240, FINAL PASSAGE (#1583) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 240, FINAL PASSAGE (#493) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Effective date 6/29/10. | |
2010-06-29 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 640. | |
2010-06-21 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/22. | |
2010-06-20 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-20 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-18 | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2010-06-16 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2010-06-16 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-16 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-06-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010. | |
2010-06-11 | Notice given. | |
2010-06-11 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-06-04 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/11/2010. | |
2010-06-02 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-27 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-05-26 | Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-07 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-05-06 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-05-05 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-04 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-03 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Education. | |
2010-03-17 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Education. |