LA SB237 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to certain tax increment financing districts. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to certain tax increment financing districts. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 237 CONCUR (#673) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 237 FINAL PASSAGE (#681) (Y: 65 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 237 FINAL PASSAGE (#312) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 237 FINAL PASSAGE (#681) (Y: 65 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 237 FINAL PASSAGE (#312) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2019. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 203. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2019-05-29 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 65, nays 20. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19. |
2019-05-21 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-20 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-15 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2019-05-14 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 1 nays; ordered re- reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |