LA SB236 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Effective date 5/25/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the crime of sexual abuse of an animal. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the crime of sexual abuse of an animal. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 236 CONCUR (#1060) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 236 CO-AUTHORS (#1059) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on SB 236 FINAL PASSAGE (#882) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on SB 236 AMENDMENT # 4255 BY CREWS MOTION TO ADOPT (#881) (Y: 30 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 236 FINAL PASSAGE (#304) (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 236 AMENDMENT # 2300 BY CLAITOR SB 236 BY MORRELL (#303) (Y: 9 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenateEffective date 5/25/2018.
2018-05-25SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 485.
2018-05-16SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-15SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-14SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays.
2018-05-11SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-05-09HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/09/18.
2018-04-27HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-26HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-25HouseReported with amendments (14-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-11HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2018-04-10HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-09SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 10 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-27SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-26SenateReported favorably.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2018-03-01SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB236&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1070694
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078955
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084512
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096784
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102075
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079210
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084390
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084297
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084421
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088742
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088271
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090282
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094800
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095105
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095327
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1070701
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079730
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079800
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084578
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090289
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101917
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084427
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095106
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096462
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096464

Bill Comments

feedback