LA SB235 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for insurance coverage for hearing aids. (8/1/18)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for insurance coverage for hearing aids. (8/1/18)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - House - House Vote on SB 235 FINAL PASSAGE (#686) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 235 FINAL PASSAGE (#235) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateEffective date 8/1/2018.
2018-05-15SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 151.
2018-05-09SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-08HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-08SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-07SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2018-05-02HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/02/18.
2018-04-16HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-13HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-12HouseReported favorably (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-05HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2018-04-04HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-03SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-22SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-21SenateReported with amendments.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2018-03-01SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB235&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1070691
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077445
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082630
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093829
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097966
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077375
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077944
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082268
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1070711
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078118
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082686
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082568
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092783

Bill Comments

feedback