LA SB233 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-18 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-18 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Expanding Louisiana's Health Care Workforce Fund. (8/1/23) (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the Expanding Louisiana's Health Care Workforce Fund. (8/1/23) (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 233 FINAL PASSAGE (#320) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 233 AMENDMENT # 1746 BY BOUDREAUX SB 233 BY CLOUD (#319) (Y: 13 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 233 AMENDMENT # 1746 BY BOUDREAUX SB 233 BY CLOUD (#319) (Y: 13 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2023-05-17 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Substitute for Senate Bill No. 181. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |