LA SB233 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-18 - Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-18 - Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the scope of argument and charges by the court in certain criminal proceedings. (8/15/10)
Title
Provides for the scope of argument and charges by the court in certain criminal proceedings. (8/15/10)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 233, REJECT (#1621) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 233, FINAL PASSAGE (#1329) (Y: 68 N: 18 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 233, FINAL PASSAGE (#327) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 233, FINAL PASSAGE (#1329) (Y: 68 N: 18 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 233, FINAL PASSAGE (#327) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-18 | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2010-06-18 | House conferees appointed: Abramson, Wooton, and Lopinto. | |
2010-06-16 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2010-06-16 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Heitmeier, Dorsey, and Marionneaux. | |
2010-06-16 | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. | |
2010-06-15 | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending. | |
2010-06-11 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2010-06-10 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 18. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-04 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2010. | |
2010-05-27 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-26 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-05-25 | Reported with amendments (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-04-27 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-04-26 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-04-26 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-04-21 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-04-20 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-06 | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary B. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Judiciary C. | |
2010-03-17 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Judiciary C. |