LA SB232 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to funds and state funds. (7/1/17) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to funds and state funds. (7/1/17) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 232 CONCUR (#893) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 232 FINAL PASSAGE (#789) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 232 FINAL PASSAGE (#224) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 232 FINAL PASSAGE (#789) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 232 FINAL PASSAGE (#224) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | Senate | Effective date: See Act. |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 361. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-06-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2017-06-05 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 103, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-05 | House | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-05 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-06-05 | House | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-05 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2017-06-05 | House | Reported with amendments (19-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-05-09 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |