LA SB23 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to temporary detention of a person in custody pending a bail hearing. (8/1/19)
Title
Provides relative to temporary detention of a person in custody pending a bail hearing. (8/1/19)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |