LA SB229 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Effective date 8/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Effective date 8/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the boundaries and certain payments to the New Orleans Exhibition Hall Authority Economic Growth and Development District. (8/1/23)
Title
Provides for the boundaries and certain payments to the New Orleans Exhibition Hall Authority Economic Growth and Development District. (8/1/23)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 229 CONCUR (#674) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 229 FINAL PASSAGE (#865) (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 229 FINAL PASSAGE (#224) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 229 FINAL PASSAGE (#865) (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 229 FINAL PASSAGE (#224) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2023. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 212. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2023-06-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2023-06-01 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 2. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2023. |
2023-05-23 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-22 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2023-05-18 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2023-05-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2023-05-09 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |