LA SB229 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-02 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-02 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for certain fees collected by the office of conservation. (gov sig) (EG DECREASE SD RV See Note)
Title
Provides for certain fees collected by the office of conservation. (gov sig) (EG DECREASE SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 229 FINAL PASSAGE (#447) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2016-04-28 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality. |