LA SB227 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the membership of the Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans. (See Act)
Title
Provides for the membership of the Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans. (See Act)
Sponsors
Sen. Jean-Paul Morrell [D] | Rep. John Bagneris [D] | Sen. Joseph Bouie [D] | Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R] |
Sen. Jimmy Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 227 CONCUR (#1056) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on SB 227 FINAL PASSAGE (#959) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 227 FINAL PASSAGE (#220) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on SB 227 FINAL PASSAGE (#959) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 227 FINAL PASSAGE (#220) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-20 | Senate | Effective date: See Act. |
2018-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 366. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-10 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18. |
2018-05-07 | House | Notice given. |
2018-05-07 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/18. |
2018-04-23 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-19 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-18 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-05 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2018-04-04 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |