LA SB224 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-20 - Notice Senate's motion to override the Governor's veto failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for voter identification information and verification requirements for absentee by mail and early voting ballots. (1/1/23)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for voter identification information and verification requirements for absentee by mail and early voting ballots. (1/1/23)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 224 PASS SUBSEQUENT TO VETO (#6) (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 224 CONCUR (#995) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 224 FINAL PASSAGE (#1034) (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 224 FINAL PASSAGE (#1034) (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 224 FINAL PASSAGE (#299) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-20HouseNotice Senate's motion to override the Governor's veto failed to pass.
2021-07-20SenateBy a vote of 24 yeas and 12 nays, the motion to override the Governor's veto failed to be adopted. Motion laid on table.
2021-07-20SenateReconsidered.
2021-07-20SenateRules suspended.
2021-07-20SenateVeto message from the Governor received and read.
2021-07-01SenateVetoed by the Governor.
2021-06-10SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
2021-06-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-09SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-08SenateRules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
2021-06-07SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2021-06-07HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 27. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2021-06-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2021.
2021-06-01HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-27HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2021-05-26HouseReported favorably (7-6-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2021-05-11HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2021-05-10SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-06SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-05SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2021-04-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2021-04-02SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=SB224&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212321
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221359
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222902
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233557
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217044
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219823
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221245
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221733
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222556
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229745
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232395
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232304
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212324
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221874
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223069
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233080
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236639
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1238128
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222789
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232594
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233042
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233449
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1237626

Bill Comments 750

feedback