LA SB224 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the individual income tax credit for donations to school tuition organizations. (1/1/20) (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides for the individual income tax credit for donations to school tuition organizations. (1/1/20) (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |